Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for public-private partnerships with a total value that exceeds $500,000,000 presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain agreements to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0361
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1424 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 8:07 PM
Click to return on the top page