Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Barkley, Beidle, Chang, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hixson, Jalisi, Kelly, Lam, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the prohibition against selling, distributing, or offering for sale an electronic device to a minor that can be used to deliver nicotine includes any component for the device or product used to refill or resupply the device; clarifying that the exception to the prohibition for devices approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration applies only to devices for sale as a tobacco cessation product; requiring the District Court to remit penalties collected to the county in which the violation of the Act occurred; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523891/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/31 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 First Reading Economic Matters and Judiciary
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {523891/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Special Order until 3/31 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 56
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 55
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM