Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Cluster, Glass, Kittleman, Kramer, McComas, Parrott, and Rey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the prohibition against causing injury to another while operating a vehicle or vessel while under the influence of or impaired by alcohol or drugs to prohibit causing serious physical injury instead of life-threatening injury.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0047 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-211, 3-212 )
(   16-205.1, 16-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM