Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan - Termination of Coverage for Retirees - Exemptions and Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Wivell, Beitzel, Buckel, Corderman, Howard, Kittleman, Krebs, Mautz, McKay, Rose, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children to elect coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan; altering to January 1, 2020, the date by which the State is required to discontinue coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain Medicare-eligible retirees, spouses, and dependent children; exempting certain retirees, spouses, and dependent children from the requirement for the State to terminate coverage under the State prescription drug benefit plan for certain individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefit Plan - Termination of Coverage for Retirees - Exemptions and Alterations
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM