Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Smith, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Healey, Hill, Jackson, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, S. Robinson, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified act of extortion by wrongful use of actual or threatened notification of law enforcement officials about another person's undocumented or illegal immigration status.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0178
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-7)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-7) 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM