Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Brooks, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Hayes, Hixson, C. Howard, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lam, Lisanti, McComas, McCray, McMillan, Miele, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Valderrama, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a victim of a specified offense to bring a civil action for treble damages against a specified person; establishing that a specified criminal conviction is not a prerequisite for maintenance of an action under the Act; providing for the recovery of reasonable attorney's fees and court costs in an action brought under the Act; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM