Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup - Reporting and Sunset Extension PG 510-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations and to provide a status report on the implementation of certain recommendations to certain entities on or before December 31, 2019, and December 31, 2020; and extending the termination date for the Workgroup to June 30, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup - Reporting and Sunset Extension PG 510-19
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM