Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, S. Howard, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jones, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McConkey, McKay, W. Miller, Otto, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain exception to allow for the involuntary admission of certain individuals who have experienced a drug overdose to certain facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital; altering certain circumstances to allow a petition for an emergency evaluation to be made for certain individuals who have experienced a drug overdose; altering the circumstances under which a court is required to endorse a petition for an emergency evaluation; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1009 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Modification
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-617, 10-622, 10-623, 10-632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM