Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Chang, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, and Morales
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing written leases for residential real property to include specified restrictions or prohibitions on smoking tobacco products in the dwelling unit or elsewhere on the premises; allowing the bylaws or regulations of a condominium to contain specified restrictions or prohibitions on smoking tobacco products; authorizing a homeowners association to include in its declaration, bylaws, rules, or recorded covenants and restrictions a prohibition on smoking tobacco products in multi-unit dwellings and common areas; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0664 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Rental Units, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Smoking Restrictions
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 11-111, 11B-111.7, 8-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM