Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Unattended Restraint of Dogs in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Cullison, Healey, Jalisi, Kaiser, Korman, Lehman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended by use of a restraint for longer than 30 minutes when the temperature is above 90 degrees Fahrenheit or below 32 degrees Fahrenheit; and providing penalties not to exceed 90 days or a fine of up $1,000 or both.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Restraint of Dogs in Extreme Temperatures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Crimes - Unattended Restraint of Dogs in Extreme Temperatures
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-623 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM