Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Financial Advisory Board - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Frush, Lam, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Financial Advisory Board within the State Department of Education to assist the State Superintendent in making preliminary assessments of waiver requests; providing for the membership of the Board; requiring the Board to take specified factors into account when reviewing specified maintenance of effort waiver requests and making a specified recommendation; requiring specified preliminary assessments of specified maintenance of effort requests to be developed in consultation with the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 5-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM