Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Arikan, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Brooks, Chang, Cox, Crosby, Griffith, Hettleman, Hornberger, Howard, Impallaria, M. Jackson, Krebs, Lehman, Long, McComas, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Saab, Solomon, R. Watson, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county superintendent of schools to allow a dependent child of a service member relocating to the State on military orders to enroll in a school in the county in accordance with certain provisions of law; requiring a county superintendent to allow a dependent child of a certain service member to apply for enrollment in a certain public school in the same manner and at the same time as individuals domiciled in the county; requiring the service member to provide certain documentation to the school by a certain time; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0391
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 224
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:58 PM