Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from recording a specified telephone conversation with a consumer under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from discontinuing a telephone conversation with a consumer on the basis that the consumer has not consented to the recording of the telephone conversation for the purpose of quality assurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4101 through 14-4103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM