Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
Sponsored by
Delegates Robinson, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lafferty, Lam, and R. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified marketer from knowingly selling or providing electric switches, electric relays, and gas valve switches that contain mercury to a consumer on or after October 1, 2018; establishing specified penalties for specified violations; and authorizing the Department of the Environment to impose specified penalties in a specified manner for specified violations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0713
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-12)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Committee Amendment {224933/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {780813/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (128-12) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {224933/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Young) Adopted 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Conway) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Committee Amendment {224933/1 Withdrawn 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {883922/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Text - Chapter - Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve Switches
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-905, 6-905.3, 6-905.3 through 6-905.6 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM