Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Bartlett, Feldmark, Fennell, Kelly, Lehman, Lopez, Proctor, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report certain information regarding the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2019, and each year thereafter; and requiring the Department, in producing the report, to consult with the Maryland Alliance for the Poor, local health departments, MedChi, the American Academy of Pediatrics Maryland Chapter, the Mid-Atlantic Association of Community Mental Health Centers, and other stakeholders.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0970
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104265/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {104265/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Rules 38
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health - Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children - Reports
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM