Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program for the Long-Term Employment of Qualified Ex-Felons
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Davis, Haynes, C. Howard, Krimm, Lisanti, McCray, Oaks, Platt, Sydnor, Turner, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a Program for the Long-Term Employment of Qualified Ex-Felons; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish the Program in consultation with the Governor's Workforce Investment Board; requiring the Department to purchase specified fidelity bonds for up 150 qualified ex-felons each year and to provide bonds to specified one-stop career centers; requiring that the Program be implemented in at least two workforce investment areas; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1301 through 11-1305 )
(   10-205, 10-306, 10-704.10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM