Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate Kittleman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a guardian of the person of a disabled person from prohibiting or restricting communication between the disabled person and a member of the disabled person's family, except as authorized by a specified court order; authorizing an individual other than a member of a disabled person's family to file a specified petition for an order to compel visitation with the disabled person; requiring a guardian to notify specified individuals within 24 hours of specified circumstances related to the disabled person; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-708.1, 13-708.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM