Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegate Hornberger
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the geographical boundary of each school district to be determined on a specified cycle; requiring each school district to be composed of a specified number of contiguous legislative districts subject to specified criteria under a specified circumstance; requiring Baltimore City to be one school district; requiring specified departments to determine school districts; establishing the membership of a school district board of education; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017, July 1, 2020, January 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - The James Samuel Coleman Act of 2017
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 3-101 through 3-104, 3-105 through 3-108, 3-108.1, 3-109 through 3-1405, 5-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM