Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Transportation to administer the Fund; requiring certain kidney dialysis centers to pay a certain fee for certain transports; establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Fund to review patient access to dialysis treatment and the direct costs incurred by counties for transporting dialysis patients to and from certain centers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0695
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Maryland Non–Emergency Medical Transportation Fund
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:20 PM
Click to return on the top page