Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Cassilly, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Hettleman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Moon, Morales, Platt, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to require each electric company to procure or provide specified energy efficiency and conservation programs and services to its electricity customers on a specified savings trajectory for the duration of the 2018-2020 and 2021-2023 program cycles; establishing a baseline for the savings trajectory; requiring that specified nonenergy benefits be quantifiable and directly related to a specified program or service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943995/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-45)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {943995/1 Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 30
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 31
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 32
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted 32
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Floor Amendment {513429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn 33
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Floor Amendment {313924/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-87) 33
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 35
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 35
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Finance 34
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {127272/1 Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 54
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (95-45) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Text - Chapter - Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM