Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Statewide Greenhouse Gas Inventory and Carbon Sequestration
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Barve
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the publication requirements for the statewide greenhouse gas emissions inventory; requiring the Department of the Environment, beginning January 1, 2020, and on January 1 of each even-numbered year thereafter through 2030, to establish a greenhouse gas emissions reduction target; requiring that the target be set at a certain amount and expressed in a certain manner; providing that the Department is not required to sequester more than a certain amount of carbon dioxide emissions; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions - Statewide Greenhouse Gas Inventory and Carbon Sequestration
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1201, 2-1202, 2-1203, 2-1214 through 2-1216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM