Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Acevero, Boyce, Buckel, Crutchfield, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, R. Lewis, Lierman, McComas, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Solomon, Valderrama, Walker, B. Barnes, Boteler, C. Branch, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Guyton, Hartman, Hornberger, Ivey, Kaiser, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Washington, Wilkins
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program to foster job creation and economic development in the State by promoting commercialization of research, facilitating technology transfer, and encouraging small business participation; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to administer the Program; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Program to provide certain competitive awards and investments to certain businesses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0398
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {735967/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/20/2020 2:16 PM