Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Ebersole, and Rosenberg
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds in order to estimate the number of 4-year-old children being served by publicly funded kindergarten programs by using the free and reduced-price meal eligibility data; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding an implementation plan based on a specified report and to present its findings to the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education by September 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {255964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {255964/1 Adopted 33
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 35
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 34
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Returned Passed 43
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Text - Chapter - Workgroup to Study the Implementation of Universal Access to Prekindergarten for 4-Year-Olds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM