Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the State
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to operate in a specified capacity and to consider specified factors when determining whether to issue a specified wetlands license; authorizing the Board of Public Works to adopt specified regulations; establishing that the State holds State wetlands for specified reasons; establishing that the Board of Public Works has specified rights and discretion when issuing a specified license; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-102, 16-202 )
(   10-204.1, 10-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM