Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Child and Dependent Care Expenses - Income Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Buckel, Corderman, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Frick, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jones, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McComas, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Robinson, Sophocleus, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $100,000 for individuals and $150,000 for married couples filing jointly the maximum income limits on eligibility for a certain credit allowed against the State income tax for certain child and dependent care expenses; altering certain income levels above which a certain phase-out of the tax credit is required; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0422
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Child and Dependent Care Expenses - Income Eligibility
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM