Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Treasurer of St. Mary's County, the Sheriff of St. Mary's County, the Judges of the Orphans' Court for St. Mary's County, the President of the Board of County Commissioners of St. Mary's County, and the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbents in those positions.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780918/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {780918/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM