Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the duties of a director of a corporation and that the director must act in good faith, in a manner the director reasonably believes to be in the best interests of the corporation, and with the care that an ordinarily prudent person in a similar position would use under similar circumstances; clarifying that a director who acts in accordance with a specified provision of law shall have specified immunity from liability; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-401, 2-405.1, 8-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM