Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Small Business Set-Aside
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Barron, J. Lewis, Angel, Barkley, Chang, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hill, Korman, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Stein, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce to make available 20% of the total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department may approve in a calendar year to small businesses; providing for the use of certain unused credits; providing for the calculation of the credit if more than a certain amount of credits are applied for in a calendar year; applying the Act to all research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Small Business Set-Aside
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM