Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Carr, Ebersole, Fennell, Luedtke, McCray, Morales, Platt, Sanchez, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2016; altering a specified limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/02/2016 Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM