Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Anderson, Atterbeary, Conaway, Dumais, Fennell, Gibson, Hill, Lam, Moon, Morales, Mosby, and Proctor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop and maintain a uniform, statewide training and certification curriculum to ensure use of best practices in sexual assault investigations; requiring the Commission to determine the percentage of officers required to receive the in-service training and the frequency at which officers should receive refresher training; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0582
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0213 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page