Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle Law
Sponsored by
Delegates Myers, Afzali, Boteler, Hogan, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, W. Miller, Norman, Otto, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, and Stocksdale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including motorcycles in the definition of "short-term vehicle rental" for purposes of determining the sales and use tax rate for short-term vehicle rentals; including motorcycles in the definition of "rental vehicle" for purposes of the Motor Vehicle Law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0486
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1012 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {799637/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
House 3/08/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {799637/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104 )
(   11-148.1, 13-939.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM