Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Use of Lead Ammunition in School Programs - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Acevero, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Qi, Queen, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a school-approved sport, club, or course of instruction from using lead ammunition in training, practice, or athletic competition.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Use of Lead Ammunition in School Programs - Prohibition
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM