Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus Depreciation
Sponsored by
Delegates Bates, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Cluster, Elliott, Guzzone, Hogan, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Norman, Otto, Schulz, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for specified deductions for the cost of business property that is treated as an expense for federal income tax purposes; limiting to property placed in service before January 1, 2014, the applicability of Maryland income tax modifications for a specified additional depreciation allowance under the federal income tax for specified business property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0157 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210.1, 10-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM