Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that, on and after the filing of an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property, the secured party shall be responsible for maintenance of the property until the foreclosure sale occurs; requiring the secured party to submit a registration to the Foreclosed Property Registry within 30 days after the filing of a foreclosure action on residential property; requiring the registration to be in a specified form and contain specified information; establishing fees; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM