Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Anderson, Atterbeary, Conaway, Dumais, Glass, Hettleman, Jalisi, J. Lewis, Lierman, Morhaim, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to identify a representative payee or fiduciary for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department, when serving as the representative payee or in any other fiduciary capacity for a child, to provide certain notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of certain actions taken with respect to certain benefits for the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0291
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0416 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-5)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {648078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-14)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {432513/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (128-5) 47A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {648078/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (118-14) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-527.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM