Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - False Statement to Law Enforcement Officer - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain prohibition against making a false statement, report, or complaint does not apply to a situation in which a government entity or its agents were the subject of a statement, report, or complaint and the government entity initiated or conducted the investigation and determined that the statement, report, or complaint was false.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - False Statement to Law Enforcement Officer - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - False Statement to Law Enforcement Officer - Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM