Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Summers, Cane, Clippinger, Frush, Gaines, Haynes, Hubbard, Ivey, Mitchell, Niemann, Stein, Walker, and Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland First Scholarship; establishing eligibility requirements for the scholarship; requiring specified information to be provided in an application for the scholarship; authorizing the use of the scholarship for specified educational expenses; authorizing the scholarship awarded to be in an annual amount up to a specified percentage of specified tuition and fees at specified institutions of higher education; establishing the Maryland First Scholarship Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {215961/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484535/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {215961/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/28/2013 3/28/2013 Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/28/2013 3/28/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {484535/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-2901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM