Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified licensing boards to collect a $100 fee for a nonprofit beer festival permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a brewing company off-site permit to specified persons who meet specified requirements; establishing that specified holders of a brewing company off-site permit may use the permit for specified activities during specified events; authorizing a nonprofit beer festival permit holder to purchase beer at wholesale to provide and sell beer for specified purposes under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0673
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493093/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604135/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {493093/1 Report Adopted 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {604135/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-105, 2-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM