Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Differential Tuition - Notification and Income Tax Subtraction Modification
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Arentz, Boteler, Buckel, Hornberger, Lisanti, Rose, Shoemaker, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public institutions of higher education that charge differential tuition to post on their websites certain information relating to differential tuition and to submit a certain report to individuals who paid the differential tuition; allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the portion of differential tuition paid by an individual for certain academic programs that is used for student scholarships or other financial aid, subject to a certain limitation; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Higher Education - Differential Tuition - Notification and Income Tax Subtraction Modification
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-126 )
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM