Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Jones
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Maryland Technology Internship Program to include certain technology-based internships with units of State and local governments; requiring that at least 50% of the internships supported by the Program each year be with businesses of 150 employees or less; establishing requirements for a unit of State or local government to participate in the Program; providing for reimbursement of up to 50% of a stipend paid to an intern; authorizing certain maximum reimbursement amounts under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574863/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {574863/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {874232/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3001, 18-3004, 18-3006, 18-3007, 18-3008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM