Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from requiring a consumer to disclose the consumer's Social Security number to the person as a condition for the purchase or lease of consumer goods or consumer services; providing that the Act does not prohibit a person from requesting or requiring a consumer to disclose the consumer's Social Security number to apply for or obtain an extension of consumer credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-3403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM