Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the driver of a school vehicle from allowing specified individuals to board or ride on the school vehicle, subject to specified exceptions; and authorizing specified individuals to board or ride on a school vehicle under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0359
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0606 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {290313/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-816 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM