Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Bachelor's Degree Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Arentz, Bates, Boteler, Cluster, Elliott, Jacobs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McMillan, Myers, Norman, Otto, Ready, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Vitale, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified community colleges in the State to offer specified bachelor's degree programs and award bachelor's degrees; requiring specified bachelor's degree programs to include specified components; and requiring specified community colleges, in coordination with the Secretary of Higher Education, to adopt specified rules and regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-210, 16-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM