Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Aumann, Clippinger, Glenn, Kramer, and Krebs
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer to direct a person to submit to specified tests if the person is involved in a motor vehicle accident that results in the death of, or a life-threatening injury to, another person and the police officer has reasonable grounds to believe that the person has been driving or attempting to drive in violation of specified alcohol- or drug-related driving prohibitions.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM