Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Niemann, Ivey, Summers, Valderrama, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified surcharge on specified costs and charges in divorce petitions; requiring a maximum of $25 of a $70 surcharge on divorce petitions to be distributed to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund and a maximum of $45 to be distributed to the Domestic Violence Program Fund; establishing the Domestic Violence Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-515 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM