Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Ali, Angel, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Korman, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Morhaim, Platt, Sanchez, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Complete Streets Program to provide matching grants to certified jurisdictions to promote healthy communities; providing for program funds to be provided by the Governor in the State budget; specifying the requirements for a local government to be designated as a certified jurisdiction; authorizing a certified jurisdiction to apply for matching grants from the Program; specifying the use of matching grant funds; specifying certain requirements for a certified jurisdiction that receives a grant under the Program; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {280514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-23)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-28)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {280514/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (112-23) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {647371/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (111-28) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-901 through 8-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM