Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Producers - Continuing Education - Online Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Serafini, Aumann, Frank, George, Hogan, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Myers, Parrott, Smigiel, and Stocksdale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Insurance Commissioner from disapproving a continuing education course for insurance producers solely on a specified basis; authorizing insurance producers to obtain all or part of the credit hours of continuing education required for license renewal from correspondence courses or online courses approved by the Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM