Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bromwell, Gaines, Glenn, Guyton, Hettleman, Jones, Lafferty, Lisanti, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Rogers, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Stein, Sydnor, Valderrama, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a $3,000 subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain veterans who are discharged or released under honorable circumstances from active military, naval, or air service of the United States; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Veterans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Veterans
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM