Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Requirement to Report Death or Disappearance of Minor - Penalties (Caylee's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a parent or other person who has permanent care or custody or responsibility for the supervision of a minor to notify, within specified periods of time, the appropriate law enforcement agency that the minor is missing; requiring a parent or other person who has permanent care or custody or responsibility for the supervision of a minor to notify the appropriate law enforcement agency or medical authority within 1 hour of becoming aware of the death that the minor has died; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0018 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-608 through 3-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM