Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Tarlau, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barron, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jalisi, Korman, Kramer, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, S. Robinson, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to convene a workgroup to study attachments to utility poles in the State; and requiring the workgroup to examine specified matters relating to pole attachments and to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573093/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {573093/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM